IA HF419 | 2019-2020 | 88th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on April 3 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-06-09 - Committee report, recommending passage. S.J. 718.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 3 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-06-09 - Committee report, recommending passage. S.J. 718.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to professional standards for the certification or designation of music therapists and providing penalties. (Formerly HSB 60.)
Title
A bill for an act relating to professional standards for the certification or designation of music therapists and providing penalties. (Formerly HSB 60.)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-03 - House - Passed House (Y: 96 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-09 | Senate | Committee report, recommending passage. S.J. 718. |
2020-02-26 | Senate | Subcommittee reassigned: R. Smith, Celsi, and Cournoyer. S.J. 451. |
2019-04-16 | Senate | Subcommittee: Miller-Meeks, Celsi, and Cournoyer. S.J. 976. |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Read first time, referred to State Government. S.J. 856. |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Message from House. S.J. 856. |
2019-04-03 | House | Immediate message. H.J. 736. |
2019-04-03 | House | Passed House, yeas 96, nays 3. H.J. 722. |
2019-02-18 | House | Introduced, placed on calendar. H.J. 304. |
Same As/Similar To
HSB60 (Related) 2019-02-12 - Subcommittee recommends amendment and passage. H.J. 261.