IA HF423 | 2019-2020 | 88th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-03 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 1081.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-03 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 1081.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to the suspension of Medicaid coverage for an inmate of a public institution. (Formerly HF 209.) Effective 7-1-19.
Title
A bill for an act relating to the suspension of Medicaid coverage for an inmate of a public institution. (Formerly HF 209.) Effective 7-1-19.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-17 - Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-19 - House - Passed House (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-19 - House - Passed House (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-03 | House | Signed by Governor. H.J. 1081. |
2019-04-29 | House | Reported correctly enrolled, signed by Speaker and President, and sent to Governor. H.J. 1079. |
2019-04-18 | House | Message from Senate. H.J. 901. |
2019-04-17 | Senate | Immediate message. S.J. 992. |
2019-04-17 | Senate | Passed Senate, yeas 50, nays 0. S.J. 989. |
2019-04-17 | Senate | Substituted for SF 415. S.J. 989. |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Placed on calendar under unfinished business. S.J. 858. |
2019-03-19 | Senate | Read first time and attached to companion SF 415. S.J. 668. |
2019-03-19 | Senate | Message from House. S.J. 668. |
2019-03-19 | House | Immediate message. H.J. 582. |
2019-03-19 | House | Passed House, yeas 95, nays none. H.J. 571. |
2019-02-18 | House | Introduced, placed on calendar. H.J. 304. |
Same As/Similar To
HF209 (Similar To) 2019-03-19 - Withdrawn. H.J. 582.
SF252 (Similar To) 2019-02-28 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 415. S.J. 436.
SF415 (Similar To) 2019-04-17 - Withdrawn. S.J. 991.
SF252 (Similar To) 2019-02-28 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 415. S.J. 436.
SF415 (Similar To) 2019-04-17 - Withdrawn. S.J. 991.