IA HF429 | 2019-2020 | 88th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Introduced on February 19 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-27 - Subcommittee recommends passage.
Pending: House Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 19 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-27 - Subcommittee recommends passage.
Pending: House Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to human growth and development course enrollment at school districts and to pupil attendance at educational conferences or seminars in which human growth and development information is provided.
Title
A bill for an act relating to human growth and development course enrollment at school districts and to pupil attendance at educational conferences or seminars in which human growth and development information is provided.
Sponsors
Sen. Sandy Salmon [R] | Rep. Tedd Gassman [R] | Rep. Jeff Shipley [R] | Rep. Skyler Wheeler [R] |
Rep. David Kerr [R] | Rep. Anne Osmundson [R] | Rep. Dean Fisher [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-27 | House | Subcommittee recommends passage. |
2019-02-26 | House | Subcommittee Meeting: 02/27/2019 10:00AM House Lounge. |
2019-02-21 | House | Subcommittee: Gassman, Gaines and Salmon. H.J. 345. |
2019-02-19 | House | Introduced, referred to Education. H.J. 309. |
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=88&ba=HF429 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/LGI/88/attachments/HF429.html |