IA HF444 | 2019-2020 | 88th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 20 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-26 - Subcommittee Meeting: 02/27/2019 12:00PM House Lounge.
Pending: House Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 20 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-26 - Subcommittee Meeting: 02/27/2019 12:00PM House Lounge.
Pending: House Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to display of the national motto by school districts.
Title
A bill for an act relating to display of the national motto by school districts.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-26 | House | Subcommittee Meeting: 02/27/2019 12:00PM House Lounge. |
2019-02-25 | House | Subcommittee: Kerr, Fry and Steckman. H.J. 353. |
2019-02-20 | House | Introduced, referred to Education. H.J. 318. |
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=88&ba=HF444 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/LGI/88/attachments/HF444.html |