IA HF514 | 2019-2020 | 88th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on February 25 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-11 - Withdrawn. H.J. 497.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 25 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-11 - Withdrawn. H.J. 497.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act allowing certain operating-while-intoxicated offenders to be sentenced as habitual offenders, and making penalties applicable. (Formerly HSB 29.)
Title
A bill for an act allowing certain operating-while-intoxicated offenders to be sentenced as habitual offenders, and making penalties applicable. (Formerly HSB 29.)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-11 | House | Withdrawn. H.J. 497. |
2019-03-11 | House | SF 113 substituted. H.J. 488. |
2019-02-25 | House | Introduced, placed on calendar. H.J. 351. |
Same As/Similar To
SSB1002 (Related) 2019-01-22 - Subcommittee recommends passage.
HSB29 (Related) 2019-02-21 - Committee report, recommending passage. H.J. 347.
SF113 (Similar To) 2019-03-21 - Signed by Governor. S.J. 711.
HSB29 (Related) 2019-02-21 - Committee report, recommending passage. H.J. 347.
SF113 (Similar To) 2019-03-21 - Signed by Governor. S.J. 711.
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=88&ba=HF514 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/LGI/88/attachments/HF514.html |