IA HF517 | 2019-2020 | 88th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on February 25 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-03 - Withdrawn. H.J. 736.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 25 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-03 - Withdrawn. H.J. 736.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to special minor's driver's licenses for students attending accredited nonpublic schools. (Formerly HF 237.)
Title
A bill for an act relating to special minor's driver's licenses for students attending accredited nonpublic schools. (Formerly HF 237.)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-03 | House | Withdrawn. H.J. 736. |
2019-04-03 | House | SF 140 substituted. H.J. 727. |
2019-02-25 | House | Introduced, placed on calendar. H.J. 351. |
Same As/Similar To
SSB1033 (Related) 2019-01-24 - Subcommittee recommends passage.
SF140 (Similar To) 2019-04-15 - Signed by Governor. S.J. 949.
HF237 (Similar To) 2019-04-03 - Withdrawn. H.J. 736.
SF140 (Similar To) 2019-04-15 - Signed by Governor. S.J. 949.
HF237 (Similar To) 2019-04-03 - Withdrawn. H.J. 736.
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=88&ba=HF517 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/LGI/88/attachments/HF517.html |