IA HF537 | 2019-2020 | 88th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 10 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-10 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 1081.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 10 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-10 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 1081.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to the imposition of certain fees on public utilities for the use of public rights-of-way. (Formerly HSB 32.) Effective 7-1-19.
Title
A bill for an act relating to the imposition of certain fees on public utilities for the use of public rights-of-way. (Formerly HSB 32.) Effective 7-1-19.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-23 - Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 32 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-16 - House - Passed House (Y: 51 N: 48 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 32 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-16 - House - Passed House (Y: 51 N: 48 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 32 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-10 | House | Signed by Governor. H.J. 1081. |
2019-04-29 | House | Reported correctly enrolled, signed by Speaker and President, and sent to Governor. H.J. 1079. |
2019-04-23 | House | Message from Senate. H.J. 962. |
2019-04-23 | Senate | Immediate message. S.J. 1067. |
2019-04-23 | Senate | Passed Senate, yeas 32, nays 18. S.J. 1066. |
2019-04-23 | Senate | Deferred. S.J. 1060. |
2019-04-23 | Senate | Substituted for SF 611. S.J. 1060. |
2019-04-17 | Senate | Read first time and attached to companion SF 611. S.J. 984. |
2019-04-17 | Senate | Message from House. S.J. 984. |
2019-04-16 | House | Immediate message. H.J. 883. |
2019-04-16 | House | Passed House, yeas 51 nays 48. H.J. 866. |
2019-04-04 | House | Placed on calendar under unfinished business. H.J. 756. |
2019-03-05 | House | Rereferred to calendar. H.J. 399. |
2019-02-26 | House | Introduced, referred to Ways and Means. H.J. 358. |
Same As/Similar To
HSB32 (Related) 2019-02-20 - Committee report, recommending passage. H.J. 333.
SSB1152 (Related) 2019-02-18 - Subcommittee Meeting: 02/19/2019 2:00PM Senate Lobbyist Lounge.
SF401 (Similar To) 2019-04-02 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 611. S.J. 827.
SF611 (Similar To) 2019-04-23 - Withdrawn. S.J. 1067.
SSB1152 (Related) 2019-02-18 - Subcommittee Meeting: 02/19/2019 2:00PM Senate Lobbyist Lounge.
SF401 (Similar To) 2019-04-02 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 611. S.J. 827.
SF611 (Similar To) 2019-04-23 - Withdrawn. S.J. 1067.