IA HF595 | 2019-2020 | 88th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 10 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-10 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 1081.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 10 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-10 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 1081.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act related to allowable annual salaries for deputy county auditors in charge of elections administration. (Formerly HSB 170.) Effective 7-1-19.
Title
A bill for an act related to allowable annual salaries for deputy county auditors in charge of elections administration. (Formerly HSB 170.) Effective 7-1-19.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-26 - Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-12 - House - Passed House (Y: 95 N: 1 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
House - Passed House (Y: 95 N: 1 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-12 - House - Passed House (Y: 95 N: 1 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
House - Passed House (Y: 95 N: 1 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-10 | House | Signed by Governor. H.J. 1081. |
2019-05-02 | House | Reported correctly enrolled, signed by Speaker and President, and sent to Governor. H.J. 1079. |
2019-04-26 | House | Message from Senate. H.J. 1045. |
2019-04-26 | Senate | Immediate message. S.J. 1151. |
2019-04-26 | Senate | Passed Senate, yeas 49, nays 0. S.J. 1148. |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Placed on calendar under unfinished business. S.J. 930. |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Committee report, recommending passage. S.J. 775. |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Subcommittee: Kraayenbrink, Guth, and J. Smith. S.J. 627. |
2019-03-13 | Senate | Read first time, referred to Local Government. S.J. 598. |
2019-03-13 | Senate | Message from House. S.J. 598. |
2019-03-12 | House | Immediate message. H.J. 523. |
2019-03-12 | House | Passed House, yeas 95, nays 1. H.J. 518. |
2019-03-04 | House | Introduced, placed on calendar. H.J. 389. |
Same As/Similar To
HSB170 (Related) 2019-02-26 - Committee report, recommending amendment and passage. H.J. 367.
SF300 (Similar To) 2019-02-21 - Subcommittee: Segebart, Guth, and J. Smith. S.J. 380.
SF300 (Similar To) 2019-02-21 - Subcommittee: Segebart, Guth, and J. Smith. S.J. 380.