IA HF596 | 2019-2020 | 88th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-09 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 1081.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-09 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 1081.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to incentives for whole grade sharing and school district reorganization or dissolution. (Formerly HSB 130.) Effective 7-1-19.
Title
A bill for an act relating to incentives for whole grade sharing and school district reorganization or dissolution. (Formerly HSB 130.) Effective 7-1-19.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-25 - Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-17 - House - Passed House (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-17 - House - Passed House (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-09 | Senate | Signed by Governor. H.J. 1081. |
2019-05-02 | Senate | Reported correctly enrolled, signed by Speaker and President, and sent to Governor. H.J. 1079. |
2019-04-25 | Senate | Immediate message. S.J. 1130. |
2019-04-25 | Senate | Passed Senate, yeas 50, nays 0. S.J. 1129. |
2019-04-25 | Senate | Substituted for SF 602. S.J. 1129. |
2019-04-17 | Senate | Read first time and attached to companion SF 602. S.J. 996. |
2019-04-17 | Senate | Message from House. S.J. 996. |
2019-04-17 | House | Immediate message. H.J. 899. |
2019-04-24 | House | Explanation of vote. H.J. 1012. |
2019-04-17 | House | Passed House, yeas 97 nays none. H.J. 888. |
2019-04-04 | House | Placed on calendar under unfinished business. H.J. 756. |
2019-03-04 | House | Introduced, placed on calendar. H.J. 389. |
Same As/Similar To
SSB1032 (Related) 2019-01-24 - Subcommittee recommends passage.
SF138 (Similar To) 2019-03-21 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 602. S.J. 710.
HSB130 (Related) 2019-02-28 - Committee report, recommending passage. H.J. 382.
SF602 (Similar To) 2019-04-25 - Withdrawn. S.J. 1130.
SF138 (Similar To) 2019-03-21 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 602. S.J. 710.
HSB130 (Related) 2019-02-28 - Committee report, recommending passage. H.J. 382.
SF602 (Similar To) 2019-04-25 - Withdrawn. S.J. 1130.