IA HF600 | 2019-2020 | 88th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on March 4 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-03 - Withdrawn. H.J. 736.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 4 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-03 - Withdrawn. H.J. 736.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to nonsubstantive Code corrections. (Formerly HSB 136.)
Title
A bill for an act relating to nonsubstantive Code corrections. (Formerly HSB 136.)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-03 | House | Withdrawn. H.J. 736. |
2019-04-03 | House | SF 333 substituted. H.J. 726. |
2019-03-04 | House | Introduced, placed on calendar. H.J. 389. |
Same As/Similar To
HSB136 (Related) 2019-02-26 - Committee report, recommending passage. H.J. 365.
SSB1140 (Related) 2019-02-14 - Subcommittee recommends passage.
SF333 (Similar To) 2019-04-15 - Signed by Governor. S.J. 949.
SSB1140 (Related) 2019-02-14 - Subcommittee recommends passage.
SF333 (Similar To) 2019-04-15 - Signed by Governor. S.J. 949.
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=88&ba=HF600 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/LGI/88/attachments/HF600.html |