IA HF603 | 2019-2020 | 88th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on March 4 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-16 - Withdrawn. H.J. 883.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 4 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-16 - Withdrawn. H.J. 883.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to snowmobile user permits and registration fees. (Formerly HSB 104; See HF 749.)
Title
A bill for an act relating to snowmobile user permits and registration fees. (Formerly HSB 104; See HF 749.)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-16 | House | Withdrawn. H.J. 883. |
2019-03-26 | House | Committee report, recommending passage. H.J. 624. |
2019-03-20 | House | Subcommittee recommends passage. |
2019-03-19 | House | Subcommittee Meeting: 03/20/2019 2:00PM House Lounge. |
2019-03-05 | House | Subcommittee: Zumbach, Kurtz and Maxwell. H.J. 401. |
2019-03-04 | House | Introduced, referred to Ways and Means. H.J. 390. |
Same As/Similar To
HSB104 (Related) 2019-02-28 - Committee report, recommending passage. H.J. 383.
HF749 (Similar To) 2020-02-27 - Subcommittee recommends amendment and passage.
HF749 (Similar To) 2020-02-27 - Subcommittee recommends amendment and passage.
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=88&ba=HF603 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/LGI/88/attachments/HF603.html |