IA HF644 | 2019-2020 | 88th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 10 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-10 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 1082.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 10 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-10 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 1082.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to juvenile justice, including provisions relating to child foster care and parent visitation in child in need of assistance proceedings. (Formerly HSB 184.) Effective 7-1-19.
Title
A bill for an act relating to juvenile justice, including provisions relating to child foster care and parent visitation in child in need of assistance proceedings. (Formerly HSB 184.) Effective 7-1-19.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-23 - Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-19 - House - Passed House (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-19 - House - Passed House (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-10 | House | Signed by Governor. H.J. 1082. |
2019-04-29 | House | Reported correctly enrolled, signed by Speaker and President, and sent to Governor. H.J. 1079. |
2019-04-23 | House | Message from Senate. H.J. 948. |
2019-04-23 | Senate | Immediate message. S.J. 1054. |
2019-04-23 | Senate | Passed Senate, yeas 49, nays 0. S.J. 1050. |
2019-04-23 | Senate | Substituted for SF 477. S.J. 1050. |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Placed on calendar under unfinished business. S.J. 857. |
2019-03-19 | Senate | Read first time and attached to companion SF 477. S.J. 669. |
2019-03-19 | Senate | Message from House. S.J. 669. |
2019-03-19 | House | Immediate message. H.J. 582. |
2019-03-19 | House | Passed House, yeas 96, nays none. H.J. 576. |
2019-03-13 | House | Fiscal note. |
2019-03-06 | House | Introduced, placed on calendar. H.J. 415. |
Same As/Similar To
HSB184 (Related) 2019-02-28 - Committee report, recommending passage. H.J. 382.
SSB1209 (Related) 2019-02-28 - Subcommittee recommends passage.
SF477 (Similar To) 2019-04-23 - Withdrawn. S.J. 1051.
SSB1209 (Related) 2019-02-28 - Subcommittee recommends passage.
SF477 (Similar To) 2019-04-23 - Withdrawn. S.J. 1051.