IA HF668 | 2019-2020 | 88th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 21 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-21 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 618.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

A bill for an act concerning alcoholic beverage control, relating to limitations on business interests of certain manufacturers, wholesalers, and retailers of alcoholic beverages. (Formerly HSB 210.) Effective 7-1-19.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

A bill for an act concerning alcoholic beverage control, relating to limitations on business interests of certain manufacturers, wholesalers, and retailers of alcoholic beverages. (Formerly HSB 210.) Effective 7-1-19.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-13 - Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 38 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-13 - House - Passed House (Y: 80 N: 19 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 38 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - Passed House (Y: 80 N: 19 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-21HouseSigned by Governor. H.J. 618.
2019-03-20HouseReported correctly enrolled, signed by Speaker and President, and sent to Governor. H.J. 600.
2019-03-13HouseMessage from Senate. H.J. 536.
2019-03-13SenateImmediate message. S.J. 609.
2019-03-13SenatePassed Senate, yeas 38, nays 11. S.J. 609.
2019-03-13SenateSubstituted for SF 533. S.J. 608.
2019-03-13SenateRead first time and attached to similar SF 533. S.J. 605.
2019-03-13SenateMessage from House. S.J. 605.
2019-03-13HouseImmediate message. H.J. 535.
2019-03-13HousePassed House, yeas 80, nays 19. H.J. 533.
2019-03-13HouseAmendment H-1010 adopted. H.J. 533.
2019-03-11HouseAmendment H-1010 filed. H.J. 498.
2019-03-08HouseIntroduced, placed on calendar. H.J. 474.

Same As/Similar To

HSB210 (Related) 2019-03-05 - Committee report, recommending amendment and passage. H.J. 403.
SSB1216 (Related) 2019-02-28 - Subcommittee recommends amendment and passage.
SF533 (Similar To) 2019-03-13 - Withdrawn. S.J. 609.

Iowa State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback