IA HF690 | 2019-2020 | 88th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 1 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-01 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 1083.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 1 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-01 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 1083.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to mental health and disability services, including the establishment of a children's behavioral health system and a children's behavioral health system state board, and requiring certain children's behavioral health core services. (Formerly HSB 206.) Effective 7-1-19.
Title
A bill for an act relating to mental health and disability services, including the establishment of a children's behavioral health system and a children's behavioral health system state board, and requiring certain children's behavioral health core services. (Formerly HSB 206.) Effective 7-1-19.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-16 - Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 46 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-21 - House - Passed House (Y: 83 N: 14 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 46 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
House - Passed House (Y: 83 N: 14 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-21 - House - Passed House (Y: 83 N: 14 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 46 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
House - Passed House (Y: 83 N: 14 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-01 | House | Signed by Governor. H.J. 1083. |
2019-04-29 | House | Reported correctly enrolled, signed by Speaker and President, and sent to Governor. H.J. 1079. |
2019-04-16 | House | Message from Senate. H.J. 883. |
2019-04-16 | Senate | Immediate message. S.J. 980. |
2019-04-16 | Senate | Passed Senate, yeas 46, nays 2. S.J. 980. |
2019-04-16 | Senate | Amendment S-3164 withdrawn. S.J. 979. |
2019-04-16 | Senate | Amendment S-3167 filed, lost. S.J. 979. |
2019-04-16 | Senate | Deferred. S.J. 979. |
2019-04-16 | Senate | Point of order raised on S-3164, deferred. S.J. 978. |
2019-04-16 | Senate | Amendment S-3164 filed. S.J. 978. |
2019-04-16 | Senate | Deferred. S.J. 967. |
2019-04-16 | Senate | Substituted for SF 479. S.J. 967. |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Placed on calendar under unfinished business. S.J. 857. |
2019-03-25 | Senate | Read first time and attached to similar SF 479. S.J. 714. |
2019-03-25 | Senate | Message from House. S.J. 714. |
2019-03-21 | House | Immediate message. H.J. 616. |
2019-03-25 | House | Explanation of vote. H.J. 622. |
2019-03-21 | House | Passed House, yeas 83, nays 14. H.J. 606. |
2019-03-21 | House | Amendment H-1023 adopted. H.J. 606. |
2019-03-21 | House | Amendment H-1038 adopted. H.J. 606. |
2019-03-21 | House | Motion to suspend rules failed. H.J. 606. |
2019-03-25 | House | Explanation of vote. H.J. 622. |
2019-03-21 | House | Motion to suspend rules for consideration of H-1069. H.J. 605. |
2019-03-21 | House | Objection filed. H.J. 605. |
2019-03-21 | House | Asked unanimous consent to suspend the rules for consideration of H-1069 H.J. 605. |
2019-03-21 | House | Point of order raised on H-1069, ruled not germane. H.J. 604. |
2019-03-21 | House | Amendment H-1046 to H-1041 out of order. H.J. 604. |
2019-03-21 | House | Amendment H-1041 withdrawn. H.J. 604. |
2019-03-20 | House | Amendment H-1069 filed. H.J. 601. |
2019-03-19 | House | Amendment H-1046 filed. H.J. 586. |
2019-03-19 | House | Fiscal note. |
2019-03-18 | House | Amendment H-1041 filed. H.J. 566. |
2019-03-18 | House | Amendment H-1038 filed. H.J. 565. |
2019-03-12 | House | Amendment H-1023 filed. H.J. 526. |
2019-03-11 | House | Introduced, placed on calendar. H.J. 480. |
Same As/Similar To
SSB1197 (Related) 2019-02-25 - Subcommittee Meeting: 02/27/2019 11:00AM RM 22.
HSB206 (Related) 2019-03-06 - Committee report, recommending amendment and passage. H.J. 419.
SF479 (Similar To) 2019-04-16 - Withdrawn. S.J. 980.
HSB206 (Related) 2019-03-06 - Committee report, recommending amendment and passage. H.J. 419.
SF479 (Similar To) 2019-04-16 - Withdrawn. S.J. 980.