IA HF710 | 2019-2020 | 88th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 19 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-20 - Subcommittee: Greene, Edler, and Quirmbach. S.J. 695.
Pending: Senate Human Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 19 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-20 - Subcommittee: Greene, Edler, and Quirmbach. S.J. 695.
Pending: Senate Human Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to the operation of the board of medicine, the board of nursing, the board of pharmacy, and the dental board. (Formerly HF 212.)
Title
A bill for an act relating to the operation of the board of medicine, the board of nursing, the board of pharmacy, and the dental board. (Formerly HF 212.)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-19 - House - Passed House (Y: 51 N: 46 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-20 | Senate | Subcommittee: Greene, Edler, and Quirmbach. S.J. 695. |
2019-03-19 | Senate | Read first time, referred to Human Resources. S.J. 670. |
2019-03-19 | Senate | Message from House. S.J. 670. |
2019-03-19 | House | Immediate message. H.J. 582. |
2019-03-19 | House | Passed House, yeas 51, nays 46. H.J. 580. |
2019-03-19 | House | Amendment H-1021 adopted. H.J. 580. |
2019-03-12 | House | Amendment H-1021 filed. H.J. 526. |
2019-03-11 | House | Introduced, placed on calendar. H.J. 494. |
Same As/Similar To
HF212 (Similar To) 2019-03-19 - Withdrawn. H.J. 582.