IA HF714 | 2019-2020 | 88th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on March 11 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-05 - Subcommittee: Mohr, G., Breckenridge and Fisher. H.J. 199.
Pending: House Public Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 11 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-05 - Subcommittee: Mohr, G., Breckenridge and Fisher. H.J. 199.
Pending: House Public Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to ignition interlock device requirements for a first operating-while-intoxicated offense. (Formerly HF 16.)
Title
A bill for an act relating to ignition interlock device requirements for a first operating-while-intoxicated offense. (Formerly HF 16.)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-05 | House | Subcommittee: Mohr, G., Breckenridge and Fisher. H.J. 199. |
2019-04-04 | House | Referred to Public Safety. H.J. 755. |
2019-03-11 | House | Introduced, placed on calendar. H.J. 495. |
Same As/Similar To
HF16 (Similar To) 2019-03-07 - Committee report, recommending passage. H.J. 469.
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=88&ba=HF714 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/LGI/88/attachments/HF714.html |