IA HF718 | 2019-2020 | 88th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on March 12 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-22 - Withdrawn. H.J. 945.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 12 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-22 - Withdrawn. H.J. 945.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to the power of cities to regulate certain building restrictions. (Formerly HSB 233.)
Title
A bill for an act relating to the power of cities to regulate certain building restrictions. (Formerly HSB 233.)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-22 | House | Withdrawn. H.J. 945. |
2019-04-22 | House | SF 447 substituted. H.J. 942. |
2019-04-22 | House | Amendment H-1225 adopted. H.J. 942. |
2019-04-16 | House | Amendment H-1225 filed. H.J. 885. |
2019-04-04 | House | Placed on calendar under unfinished business. H.J. 757. |
2019-03-12 | House | Introduced, placed on calendar. H.J. 502. |
Same As/Similar To
SSB1212 (Related) 2019-02-27 - Subcommittee recommends amendment and passage.
HSB233 (Related) 2019-03-07 - Committee report, recommending passage. H.J. 470.
SF447 (Similar To) 2019-05-02 - Signed by Governor. S.J. 1196.
HSB233 (Related) 2019-03-07 - Committee report, recommending passage. H.J. 470.
SF447 (Similar To) 2019-05-02 - Signed by Governor. S.J. 1196.
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=88&ba=HF718 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/LGI/88/attachments/HF718.html |