IA HF721 | 2019-2020 | 88th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on March 12 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-27 - Referred to Judiciary. H.J. 1076.
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 12 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-27 - Referred to Judiciary. H.J. 1076.
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to the temporary delegation of parental authority by the parent, guardian, or legal custodian of a child. (Formerly HSB 134.)
Title
A bill for an act relating to the temporary delegation of parental authority by the parent, guardian, or legal custodian of a child. (Formerly HSB 134.)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-27 | House | Referred to Judiciary. H.J. 1076. |
2019-04-15 | House | Amendment H-1213 filed. H.J. 859. |
2019-04-04 | House | Placed on calendar under unfinished business. H.J. 757. |
2019-03-19 | House | Amendments H-1055, H-1056 and H-1060 filed. H.J. 587. |
2019-03-19 | House | Amendments H-1049, H-1052 and H-1053 filed. H.J. 586. |
2019-03-12 | House | Introduced, placed on calendar. H.J. 503. |
Same As/Similar To
HSB134 (Related) 2019-03-07 - Subcommittee recommends amendment and passage. H.J. 468.
SF360 (Similar To) 2019-03-07 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 540. S.J. 507.
SF540 (Similar To) 2019-04-27 - Rereferred to Judiciary. H.J. 1077.
SF360 (Similar To) 2019-03-07 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 540. S.J. 507.
SF540 (Similar To) 2019-04-27 - Rereferred to Judiciary. H.J. 1077.
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=88&ba=HF721 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/LGI/88/attachments/HF721.html |