IA HF744 | 2019-2020 | 88th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on April 22 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-24 - Subcommittee recommends passage.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 22 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-24 - Subcommittee recommends passage.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to licensing fees collected by the board of educational examiners and deposited in the general fund of the state, and including effective date provisions. (Formerly HF 633 and HF 256.)
Title
A bill for an act relating to licensing fees collected by the board of educational examiners and deposited in the general fund of the state, and including effective date provisions. (Formerly HF 633 and HF 256.)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-22 - House - Passed House (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - Passed House (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - Passed House (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-24 | Senate | Subcommittee recommends passage. |
2019-04-23 | Senate | Subcommittee: Chapman, Quirmbach, and R. Smith. S.J. 1074. |
2019-04-23 | Senate | Read first time, referred to Ways and Means. S.J. 1049. |
2019-04-23 | Senate | Message from House. S.J. 1049. |
2019-04-22 | House | Immediate message. H.J. 945. |
2019-04-24 | House | Explanation of vote. H.J. 1012. |
2019-04-22 | House | Passed House, yeas 97 nays none. H.J. 932. |
2019-03-25 | House | Fiscal note. |
2019-03-19 | House | Introduced, placed on Ways and Means calendar. H.J. 583. |
Same As/Similar To
HF256 (Similar To) 2019-04-22 - Withdrawn. H.J. 945.
HF633 (Similar To) 2019-04-22 - Withdrawn. H.J. 945.
HF633 (Similar To) 2019-04-22 - Withdrawn. H.J. 945.