IA HF749 | 2019-2020 | 88th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 16 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-04-18 - Subcommittee recommends passage.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

A bill for an act relating to snowmobile user permits and registration fees. (Formerly HF 603 and HSB 104.)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

A bill for an act relating to snowmobile user permits and registration fees. (Formerly HF 603 and HSB 104.)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-16 - House - Passed House (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-18SenateSubcommittee recommends passage.
2019-04-17SenateSubcommittee: Brown, Edler, and Giddens. S.J. 986.
2019-04-17SenateRead first time, referred to Ways and Means. S.J. 985.
2019-04-17SenateMessage from House. S.J. 985.
2019-04-16HouseImmediate message. H.J. 883.
2019-04-16HousePassed House, yeas 99 nays none. H.J. 870.
2019-03-26HouseIntroduced, placed on Ways and Means calendar. H.J. 649.

Same As/Similar To

HSB104 (Related) 2019-02-28 - Committee report, recommending passage. H.J. 383.
HF603 (Similar To) 2019-04-16 - Withdrawn. H.J. 883.

Iowa State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback