IA HF759 | 2019-2020 | 88th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 13 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-13 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 1084.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 13 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-13 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 1084.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to and making appropriations and related statutory changes involving certain state departments, agencies, funds, and certain other entities, providing for regulatory authority, and other properly related matters. (Formerly HSB 249.) Effective 7-1-19, with exception of Division III effective 5-13-19.
Title
A bill for an act relating to and making appropriations and related statutory changes involving certain state departments, agencies, funds, and certain other entities, providing for regulatory authority, and other properly related matters. (Formerly HSB 249.) Effective 7-1-19, with exception of Division III effective 5-13-19.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-26 - House - Passed House (Y: 54 N: 44 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-26 - Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 34 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-09 - House - Passed House (Y: 54 N: 46 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - Passed House (Y: 54 N: 44 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 34 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
House - Passed House (Y: 54 N: 46 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-26 - Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 34 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-09 - House - Passed House (Y: 54 N: 46 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - Passed House (Y: 54 N: 44 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 34 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
House - Passed House (Y: 54 N: 46 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-13 | Senate | Signed by Governor. H.J. 1084. |
2019-05-07 | Senate | Reported correctly enrolled, signed by Speaker and President, and sent to Governor. H.J. 1079. |
2019-04-26 | Senate | NOBA: Final |
2019-04-26 | Senate | Message from House. S.J. 1157. |
2019-04-26 | House | Immediate message. H.J. 1048. |
2019-04-27 | House | Explanation of vote. H.J. 1077. |
2019-04-26 | House | NOBA: Senate Floor |
2019-04-26 | House | Explanation of vote. H.J. 1054. |
2019-04-26 | House | Passed House, yeas 54 nays 44. H.J. 1047. |
2019-04-26 | House | House concurred in Senate amendment H-1314. H.J. 1047. |
2019-04-26 | House | Message from Senate. H.J. 1046. |
2019-04-26 | Senate | Immediate message. S.J. 1147. |
2019-04-26 | Senate | Passed Senate, yeas 34, nays 15. S.J. 1147. |
2019-04-26 | Senate | Amendment S-3173 out of order. S.J. 1146. |
2019-04-26 | Senate | Amendments S-3236 adopted. S.J. 1146. |
2019-04-26 | Senate | Amendment S-3242 to S-3236 filed, ruled out of order. S.J. 1146. |
2019-04-26 | Senate | Amendment S-3241 lost. S.J. 1146. |
2019-04-26 | Senate | Point of order raised on S-3241, ruled in order. S.J. 1145. |
2019-04-26 | Senate | Deferred. S.J. 1142. |
2019-04-26 | Senate | Amendment S-3241 to S-3236 filed. S.J. 1142. |
2019-04-25 | Senate | Amendment S-3236 filed. S.J. 1140. |
2019-04-17 | Senate | NOBA: Senate Full Approps |
2019-04-17 | Senate | Amendment S-3173 filed. S.J. 987. |
2019-04-15 | Senate | NOBA: Senate Sub |
2019-04-17 | Senate | Committee report, recommending amendment and passage. S.J. 987. |
2019-04-10 | Senate | NOBA: House Floor |
2019-04-10 | Senate | Subcommittee: Guth, Celsi, R. Taylor, Whiting, and Zumbach. S.J. 927. |
2019-04-10 | Senate | Read first time, referred to Appropriations. S.J. 911. |
2019-04-10 | Senate | Message from House. S.J. 911. |
2019-04-09 | House | Immediate message. H.J. 794. |
2019-04-09 | House | Passed House, yeas 54 nays 46. H.J. 781. |
2019-04-09 | House | Amendment H-1145 withdrawn. H.J. 781. |
2019-04-09 | House | Amendment H-1143 withdrawn. H.J. 781. |
2019-04-09 | House | Amendment H-1139 adopted, as amended. H.J. 780. |
2019-04-09 | House | Amendment H-1162 to H-1139 filed, adopted. H.J. 780. |
2019-04-09 | House | Motion to suspend rules failed. H.J. 779. |
2019-04-09 | House | Motion to suspend rules for consideration of H-1140. H.J. 779. |
2019-04-09 | House | Point of order raised on H-1140, ruled not germane. H.J. 778. |
2019-04-09 | House | Motion to suspend rules failed. H.J. 778. |
2019-04-09 | House | Motion to suspend rules for consideration of H-1148. H.J. 777. |
2019-04-09 | House | Point of order raised on H-1148, ruled not germane. H.J. 777. |
2019-04-09 | House | Amendment H-1144 adopted. H.J. 777. |
2019-04-09 | House | Speaker ruled point not well taken and H-1144 germane. H.J. 776. |
2019-04-09 | House | Point of order raised on H-1144. H.J. 776. |
2019-04-09 | House | Point of order raised on H-1142, ruled not germane. H.J. 776. |
2019-04-09 | House | Motion to suspend rules failed. H.J. 776. |
2019-04-09 | House | Motion to suspend rules for consideration of H-1141. H.J. 775. |
2019-04-09 | House | Point of order raised on H-1141, ruled not germane. H.J. 775. |
2019-04-09 | House | Amendment H-1147 lost. H.J. 774. |
2019-04-09 | House | Amendment H-1119 adopted. H.J. 774. |
2019-04-09 | House | Amendment H-1146 lost. H.J. 773. |
2019-04-08 | House | Amendments H-1139, H-1140, H-1141, H-1142, H-1143, H-1144, H-1145, H-1146, H-1147 and H-1148 filed. H.J. 767. |
2019-04-08 | House | Placed on calendar under unfinished business. H.J. 763. |
2019-04-03 | House | Amendment H-1119 filed. H.J. 740. |
2019-04-01 | House | NOBA: House Full Approps |
2019-04-01 | House | Introduced, placed on Appropriations calendar. H.J. 706. |
Same As/Similar To
HSB249 (Related) 2019-04-01 - Committee report, recommending passage. H.J. 708.