IA HF764 | 2019-2020 | 88th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 10 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-10 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 1084.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 10 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-10 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 1084.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to publication and procedural provisions relating to proposed constitutional amendments and including effective date provisions. (Formerly HSB 247.) Effective 5-10-19.
Title
A bill for an act relating to publication and procedural provisions relating to proposed constitutional amendments and including effective date provisions. (Formerly HSB 247.) Effective 5-10-19.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-27 - Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 40 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-04-22 - House - Passed House (Y: 54 N: 44 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 40 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
House - Passed House (Y: 54 N: 44 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-22 - House - Passed House (Y: 54 N: 44 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 40 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
House - Passed House (Y: 54 N: 44 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-10 | House | Signed by Governor. H.J. 1084. |
2019-05-07 | House | Reported correctly enrolled, signed by Speaker and President, and sent to Governor. H.J. 1079. |
2019-04-27 | House | Message from Senate. H.J. 1075. |
2019-04-27 | Senate | Immediate message. S.J. 1170. |
2019-04-27 | Senate | Passed Senate, yeas 40, nays 8. S.J. 1169. |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Committee report, recommending passage. S.J. 1112. |
2019-04-23 | Senate | Subcommittee: Sinclair, Bisignano, Celsi, Lofgren, and Whiting. S.J. 1074. |
2019-04-23 | Senate | Read first time, referred to Government Oversight. S.J. 1049. |
2019-04-23 | Senate | Message from House. S.J. 1049. |
2019-04-22 | House | Immediate message. H.J. 945. |
2019-04-24 | House | Explanation of vote. H.J. 1012. |
2019-04-22 | House | Passed House, yeas 54 nays 44. H.J. 944. |
2019-04-22 | House | Amendment H-1238 adopted. H.J. 944. |
2019-04-17 | House | Amendment H-1238 filed. H.J. 900. |
2019-04-04 | House | Introduced, placed on calendar. H.J. 754. |
Same As/Similar To
HSB247 (Related) 2019-04-04 - Committee report, recommending amendment and passage. H.J. 758.