IA HF772 | 2019-2020 | 88th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 20 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-20 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 1084.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 20 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-20 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 1084.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act creating an empower rural Iowa Act to provide incentives for broadband and workforce housing, and including effective date and applicability provisions. (Formerly HSB 204.) Effective 7-1-19, with exception of Division III effective 5-20-19.
Title
A bill for an act creating an empower rural Iowa Act to provide incentives for broadband and workforce housing, and including effective date and applicability provisions. (Formerly HSB 204.) Effective 7-1-19, with exception of Division III effective 5-20-19.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-24 - Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-23 - House - Passed House (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - Passed House (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-23 - House - Passed House (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - Passed House (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-20 | House | Signed by Governor. H.J. 1084. |
2019-05-02 | House | Reported correctly enrolled, signed by Speaker and President, and sent to Governor. H.J. 1079. |
2019-04-24 | House | Message from Senate. H.J. 997. |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Immediate message. S.J. 1093. |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Passed Senate, yeas 50, nays 0. S.J. 1093. |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Substituted for SF 625. S.J. 1092. |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Read first time and attached to similar SF 625. S.J. 1079. |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Message from House. S.J. 1079. |
2019-04-23 | House | Immediate message. H.J. 979. |
2019-04-24 | House | Explanation of vote. H.J. 1012. |
2019-04-23 | House | Explanation of vote. H.J. 981. |
2019-04-23 | House | Passed House, yeas 98 nays none. H.J. 951. |
2019-04-23 | House | Amendment H-1248 withdrawn. H.J. 951. |
2019-04-23 | House | Amendment H-1247 adopted, as amended. H.J. 951. |
2019-04-23 | House | Amendment H-1272 to amendment H-1247 filed, adopted. H.J. 950. |
2019-04-23 | House | Amendment H-1246 adopted. H.J. 950. |
2019-04-18 | House | Amendments H-1246, H-1247 and H-1248 filed. H.J. 926. |
2019-04-16 | House | Fiscal note. |
2019-04-10 | House | Introduced, placed on Ways and Means calendar. H.J. 810. |
Same As/Similar To
SSB1193 (Related) 2019-03-21 - Subcommittee recommends amendment and passage.
HSB204 (Related) 2019-04-10 - Committee report, recommending amendment and passage. H.J. 811.
SF625 (Similar To) 2019-04-24 - Withdrawn. S.J. 1093.
HSB204 (Related) 2019-04-10 - Committee report, recommending amendment and passage. H.J. 811.
SF625 (Similar To) 2019-04-24 - Withdrawn. S.J. 1093.