IA HF778 | 2019-2020 | 88th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 21 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-21 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 1084.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 21 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-21 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 1084.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to taking a capital gain deduction for the sale of real property used in a farming business. (Formerly HSB 188.) Effective 7-1-19.
Title
A bill for an act relating to taking a capital gain deduction for the sale of real property used in a farming business. (Formerly HSB 188.) Effective 7-1-19.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-25 - Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-21 | House | Signed by Governor. H.J. 1084. |
2019-04-29 | House | Reported correctly enrolled, signed by Speaker and President, and sent to Governor. H.J. 1079. |
2019-04-25 | House | Message from Senate. H.J. 1016. |
2019-04-25 | Senate | Immediate message. S.J. 1124. |
2019-04-25 | Senate | Passed Senate, yeas 49, nays 0. S.J. 1121. |
2019-04-25 | Senate | Substituted for SF 627. S.J. 1121. |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Read first time and attached to companion SF 627. S.J. 1103. |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Message from House. S.J. 1103. |
2019-04-24 | House | Immediate message. H.J. 1002. |
2019-04-24 | House | Passed House, yeas 68 nays 32. H.J. 1001. |
2019-04-23 | House | Fiscal note. |
2019-04-18 | House | Introduced, placed on Ways and Means calendar. H.J. 923. |
Same As/Similar To
SF192 (Similar To) 2019-04-17 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 627. S.J. 1010.
HSB188 (Related) 2019-04-18 - Committee report, recommending passage. H.J. 925.
SF627 (Similar To) 2019-04-25 - Withdrawn. S.J. 1122.
HSB188 (Related) 2019-04-18 - Committee report, recommending passage. H.J. 925.
SF627 (Similar To) 2019-04-25 - Withdrawn. S.J. 1122.