IA HF779 | 2019-2020 | 88th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 16 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-16 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 1084.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 16 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-16 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 1084.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to the administration of the tax and related laws by the department of revenue, including the administration and modification of certain tax credits and refunds, the individual and corporate income taxes, franchise taxes, moneys and credits taxes, sales and use taxes, and automobile rental excise taxes, the assessment of property owned by certain long distance telephone companies, establishing a taxation and exemption of computers task force, extending the utility replacement task force, and providing for other properly related matters, making penalties applicable, and including effective date and retroactive applicability provisions. (Formerly HSB 257.) Various effective dates, see bill.
Title
A bill for an act relating to the administration of the tax and related laws by the department of revenue, including the administration and modification of certain tax credits and refunds, the individual and corporate income taxes, franchise taxes, moneys and credits taxes, sales and use taxes, and automobile rental excise taxes, the assessment of property owned by certain long distance telephone companies, establishing a taxation and exemption of computers task force, extending the utility replacement task force, and providing for other properly related matters, making penalties applicable, and including effective date and retroactive applicability provisions. (Formerly HSB 257.) Various effective dates, see bill.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-27 - Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 44 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-04-25 - House - Passed House (Y: 90 N: 8 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 44 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
House - Passed House (Y: 90 N: 8 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-25 - House - Passed House (Y: 90 N: 8 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 44 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
House - Passed House (Y: 90 N: 8 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-16 | House | Signed by Governor. H.J. 1084. |
2019-05-03 | House | Reported correctly enrolled, signed by Speaker and President, and sent to Governor. H.J. 1079. |
2019-04-27 | House | Message from Senate. H.J. 1075. |
2019-04-27 | Senate | Immediate message. S.J. 1174. |
2019-04-27 | Senate | Passed Senate, yeas 44, nays 4. S.J. 1173. |
2019-04-27 | Senate | Substituted for SF 631. S.J. 1172. |
2019-04-26 | Senate | Fiscal note. |
2019-04-26 | Senate | Read first time and attached to similar SF 631. S.J. 1145. |
2019-04-26 | Senate | Message from House. S.J. 1145. |
2019-04-25 | House | Immediate message. H.J. 1041. |
2019-04-26 | House | Explanation of vote. H.J. 1055. |
2019-04-25 | House | Passed House, yeas 90 nays 8. H.J. 1041. |
2019-04-25 | House | Motion to suspend rules failed. H.J. 1040. |
2019-04-25 | House | Motion to suspend rules for consideration of amendment H-1297. H.J. 1039. |
2019-04-25 | House | Point of order raised on H-1297, ruled not germane. H.J. 1039. |
2019-04-25 | House | Amendment H-1282 withdrawn. H.J. 1039. |
2019-04-25 | House | Amendment H-1309 adopted, as amended. H.J. 1039. |
2019-04-25 | House | Amendment H-1311 to amendment H-1309 filed, adopted. H.J. 1039. |
2019-04-25 | House | Amendment H-1309 filed. H.J. 1039. |
2019-04-24 | House | Amendment H-1297 filed. H.J. 1014. |
2019-04-23 | House | Amendment H-1282 filed. H.J. 984. |
2019-04-18 | House | Introduced, placed on Ways and Means calendar. H.J. 923. |
Same As/Similar To
HSB257 (Related) 2019-04-18 - Committee report, recommending amendment and passage. H.J. 925.