IA HF782 | 2019-2020 | 88th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on April 23 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-25 - Withdrawn. H.J. 1042.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on April 23 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-25 - Withdrawn. H.J. 1042.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act making appropriations to the department of public health for the gambling treatment program. (Formerly HSB 258.)
Title
A bill for an act making appropriations to the department of public health for the gambling treatment program. (Formerly HSB 258.)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-25 | House | Withdrawn. H.J. 1042. |
2019-04-25 | House | SF 632 substituted. H.J. 1034. |
2019-04-25 | House | Asked and received unanimous consent for immediate consideration. H.J. 1029. |
2019-04-23 | House | NOBA: House Full Approps |
2019-04-23 | House | Introduced, placed on Appropriations calendar. H.J. 953. |
Same As/Similar To
SSB1257 (Related) 2019-04-17 - Subcommittee recommends passage.
HSB258 (Related) 2019-04-23 - Committee report, recommending passage. H.J. 983.
SF632 (Similar To) 2019-05-13 - Signed by Governor. S.J. 1198.
HSB258 (Related) 2019-04-23 - Committee report, recommending passage. H.J. 983.
SF632 (Similar To) 2019-05-13 - Signed by Governor. S.J. 1198.
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=88&ba=HF782 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/LGI/88/attachments/HF782.html |