IA HSB104 | 2019-2020 | 88th General Assembly
Note: Legislation replaced by HF603
Note: Legislation replaced by HF749
Note: Legislation replaced by HF749
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: N/A - 0% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-02-28 - Committee report, recommending passage. H.J. 383.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: N/A - 0% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-02-28 - Committee report, recommending passage. H.J. 383.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to snowmobile user permits and registration fees.
Title
A bill for an act relating to snowmobile user permits and registration fees.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-28 | House | Committee report, recommending passage. H.J. 383. |
2019-02-21 | House | Subcommittee recommends passage. |
2019-02-19 | House | Subcommittee Meeting: 02/20/2019 11:00AM House Lounge. |
2019-01-31 | House | Subcommittee: Maxwell, Sieck and Steckman. H.J. 196. |
2019-01-31 | House | By COMMITTEE ON NATURAL RESOURCES |
Same As/Similar To
HF603 (Replaced by) 2019-04-16 - Withdrawn. H.J. 883.
HF749 (Replaced by) 2020-02-27 - Subcommittee recommends amendment and passage.
HF749 (Replaced by) 2020-02-27 - Subcommittee recommends amendment and passage.
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=88&ba=HSB104 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/LGI/88/attachments/HSB104.html |