IA HSB136 | 2019-2020 | 88th General Assembly
Note: Legislation replaced by SF333
Note: Legislation replaced by HF600
Note: Legislation replaced by HF600
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: N/A - 0% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-02-26 - Committee report, recommending passage. H.J. 365.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: N/A - 0% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-02-26 - Committee report, recommending passage. H.J. 365.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to nonsubstantive Code corrections.
Title
A bill for an act relating to nonsubstantive Code corrections.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-26 | House | Committee report, recommending passage. H.J. 365. |
2019-02-20 | House | Subcommittee recommends passage. |
2019-02-18 | House | Subcommittee Meeting: 02/20/2019 8:00AM House Lounge. |
2019-02-06 | House | Subcommittee: Mitchell, McKean and Konfrst. H.J. 229. |
2019-02-06 | House | By COMMITTEE ON JUDICIARY |
Same As/Similar To
SSB1140 (Related) 2019-02-14 - Subcommittee recommends passage.
SF333 (Replaced by) 2019-04-15 - Signed by Governor. S.J. 949.
HF600 (Replaced by) 2019-04-03 - Withdrawn. H.J. 736.
SF333 (Replaced by) 2019-04-15 - Signed by Governor. S.J. 949.
HF600 (Replaced by) 2019-04-03 - Withdrawn. H.J. 736.
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=88&ba=HSB136 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/LGI/88/attachments/HSB136.html |