IA HSB157 | 2019-2020 | 88th General Assembly
Note: Legislation replaced by SF114
Note: Legislation replaced by HF567
Note: Legislation replaced by HF567
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: N/A - 0% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-02-26 - Committee report, recommending passage. H.J. 366.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: N/A - 0% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-02-26 - Committee report, recommending passage. H.J. 366.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to unintentionally causing the death of a person by operating a motor vehicle at an excessive speed, providing penalties, and making penalties applicable.
Title
A bill for an act relating to unintentionally causing the death of a person by operating a motor vehicle at an excessive speed, providing penalties, and making penalties applicable.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-26 | House | Committee report, recommending passage. H.J. 366. |
2019-02-18 | House | Subcommittee recommends passage. |
2019-02-12 | House | Subcommittee Meeting: 02/14/2019 12:30PM House Lounge. |
2019-02-12 | House | Subcommittee: Mohr, G., Olson and Paustian. H.J. 260. |
2019-02-12 | House | By COMMITTEE ON PUBLIC SAFETY |
Same As/Similar To
SSB1011 (Related) 2019-01-16 - Subcommittee recommends passage.
SF114 (Replaced by) 2020-01-28 - Subcommittee recommends passage.
HF567 (Replaced by) 2019-04-27 - Referred to Public Safety. H.J. 1076.
SF114 (Replaced by) 2020-01-28 - Subcommittee recommends passage.
HF567 (Replaced by) 2019-04-27 - Referred to Public Safety. H.J. 1076.
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=88&ba=HSB157 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/LGI/88/attachments/HSB157.html |