IA HSB206 | 2019-2020 | 88th General Assembly
Note: Legislation replaced by SF479
Note: Legislation replaced by HF690
Note: Legislation replaced by HF690
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: N/A - 0% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-06 - Committee report, recommending amendment and passage. H.J. 419.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: N/A - 0% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-06 - Committee report, recommending amendment and passage. H.J. 419.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to mental health and disability services, including the establishment of a children's behavioral health system and a children's behavioral health system state board, and requiring certain children's behavioral health core services.
Title
A bill for an act relating to mental health and disability services, including the establishment of a children's behavioral health system and a children's behavioral health system state board, and requiring certain children's behavioral health core services.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-06 | House | Committee report, recommending amendment and passage. H.J. 419. |
2019-02-28 | House | Subcommittee recommends amendment and passage. |
2019-02-26 | House | Subcommittee Meeting: 02/28/2019 10:00AM House Lounge. |
2019-02-26 | House | Subcommittee: Fry, Lundgren and Brown-Powers. H.J. 363. |
2019-02-26 | House | By COMMITTEE ON HUMAN RESOURCES |
Same As/Similar To
SSB1197 (Related) 2019-02-25 - Subcommittee Meeting: 02/27/2019 11:00AM RM 22.
SF479 (Replaced by) 2019-04-16 - Withdrawn. S.J. 980.
HF690 (Replaced by) 2019-05-01 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 1083.
SF479 (Replaced by) 2019-04-16 - Withdrawn. S.J. 980.
HF690 (Replaced by) 2019-05-01 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 1083.
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=88&ba=HSB206 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/LGI/88/attachments/HSB206.html |