IA HSB210 | 2019-2020 | 88th General Assembly
Note: Legislation replaced by SF533
Note: Legislation replaced by HF668
Note: Legislation replaced by HF668
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: N/A - 0% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-05 - Committee report, recommending amendment and passage. H.J. 403.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: N/A - 0% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-05 - Committee report, recommending amendment and passage. H.J. 403.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act concerning alcoholic beverage control, relating to limitations on business interests of certain manufacturers, wholesalers, and retailers of alcoholic beverages.
Title
A bill for an act concerning alcoholic beverage control, relating to limitations on business interests of certain manufacturers, wholesalers, and retailers of alcoholic beverages.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-05 | House | Committee report, recommending amendment and passage. H.J. 403. |
2019-02-27 | House | Subcommittee recommends passage. |
2019-02-26 | House | Subcommittee Meeting: 02/27/2019 8:30AM House Lounge. |
2019-02-26 | House | Subcommittee: Carlson, Best and Hall. H.J. 363. |
2019-02-26 | House | By COMMITTEE ON COMMERCE |
Same As/Similar To
SSB1216 (Related) 2019-02-28 - Subcommittee recommends amendment and passage.
SF533 (Replaced by) 2019-03-13 - Withdrawn. S.J. 609.
HF668 (Replaced by) 2019-03-21 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 618.
SF533 (Replaced by) 2019-03-13 - Withdrawn. S.J. 609.
HF668 (Replaced by) 2019-03-21 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 618.
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=88&ba=HSB210 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/LGI/88/attachments/HSB210.html |