IA HSB30 | 2019-2020 | 88th General Assembly
Note: Legislation replaced by SF152
Note: Legislation replaced by HF328
Note: Legislation replaced by HF328
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: N/A - 0% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-02-06 - Committee report, recommending amendment and passage. H.J. 232.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: N/A - 0% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-02-06 - Committee report, recommending amendment and passage. H.J. 232.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to the definition of vulnerable elder.
Title
A bill for an act relating to the definition of vulnerable elder.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-06 | House | Committee report, recommending amendment and passage. H.J. 232. |
2019-01-31 | House | Subcommittee recommends passage. |
2019-01-28 | House | Subcommittee Meeting: 01/31/2019 9:00AM House Lounge. |
2019-01-22 | House | Subcommittee: Mitchell, Gustafson and Sunde. H.J. 131. |
2019-01-22 | House | By COMMITTEE ON JUDICIARY |
Same As/Similar To
SSB1014 (Related) 2019-01-24 - Subcommittee recommends passage.
SF152 (Replaced by) 2019-04-25 - Withdrawn. S.J. 1118.
HF328 (Replaced by) 2019-05-10 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 1080.
SF152 (Replaced by) 2019-04-25 - Withdrawn. S.J. 1118.
HF328 (Replaced by) 2019-05-10 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 1080.
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=88&ba=HSB30 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/LGI/88/attachments/HSB30.html |