IA HSB569 | 2019-2020 | 88th General Assembly
Note: Legislation replaced by HF2570
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: N/A - 0% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-21 - Committee report, recommending passage. H.J. 328.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: N/A - 0% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-21 - Committee report, recommending passage. H.J. 328.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to the regulation of certain substance-related products, and providing penalties.
Title
A bill for an act relating to the regulation of certain substance-related products, and providing penalties.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-21 | House | Committee report, recommending passage. H.J. 328. |
2020-01-30 | House | Subcommittee recommends passage. |
2020-01-28 | House | Subcommittee Meeting: 01/30/2020 12:30PM House Lounge. |
2020-01-28 | House | Subcommittee: Thorup, Fisher and Kressig. H.J. 152. |
2020-01-28 | House | By COMMITTEE ON PUBLIC SAFETY |
Same As/Similar To
HF2570 (Replaced by) 2020-03-12 - Subcommittee recommends passage.
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=88&ba=HSB569 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/LGI/88/attachments/HSB569.html |