IA HSB570 | 2019-2020 | 88th General Assembly
Note: Legislation replaced by HF2435
Note: Legislation replaced by SF2299
Note: Legislation replaced by SF2299
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: N/A - 0% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-13 - Committee report, recommending amendment and passage. H.J. 277.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: N/A - 0% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-13 - Committee report, recommending amendment and passage. H.J. 277.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to background checks for employees of certain facilities, providers, programs, and agencies.
Title
A bill for an act relating to background checks for employees of certain facilities, providers, programs, and agencies.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-13 | House | Committee report, recommending amendment and passage. H.J. 277. |
2020-02-10 | House | Subcommittee recommends passage. |
2020-02-04 | House | Subcommittee Meeting: 02/05/2020 5:30PM House Lounge. |
2020-01-29 | House | Subcommittee reassigned: Jeneary, Fry and Sunde. H.J. 164. |
2020-01-28 | House | Subcommittee: Holt, Fry and Sunde. H.J. 152. |
2020-01-28 | House | By COMMITTEE ON PUBLIC SAFETY |
Same As/Similar To
SSB3179 (Related) 2020-02-18 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 2299.
HF2435 (Replaced by) 2020-03-10 - Withdrawn. H.J. 565.
SF2299 (Replaced by) 2020-06-01 - Signed by Governor. S.J. 659.
HF2435 (Replaced by) 2020-03-10 - Withdrawn. H.J. 565.
SF2299 (Replaced by) 2020-06-01 - Signed by Governor. S.J. 659.
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=88&ba=HSB570 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/LGI/88/attachments/HSB570.html |