IA HSB611 | 2019-2020 | 88th General Assembly
Note: Legislation replaced by HF2414
Note: Legislation replaced by SF2324
Note: Legislation replaced by SF2324
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: N/A - 0% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-13 - Committee report, recommending passage. H.J. 277.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: N/A - 0% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-13 - Committee report, recommending passage. H.J. 277.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to the requirements for a sex offender to be granted a modification of sex offender registry requirements.
Title
A bill for an act relating to the requirements for a sex offender to be granted a modification of sex offender registry requirements.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-13 | House | Committee report, recommending passage. H.J. 277. |
2020-02-11 | House | Subcommittee recommends passage. |
2020-02-06 | House | Subcommittee Meeting: 02/11/2020 8:00AM House Lounge. |
2020-01-30 | House | Subcommittee: Worthan, Thorup and Kurtz. H.J. 173. |
2020-01-30 | House | By COMMITTEE ON PUBLIC SAFETY |
Same As/Similar To
SSB3133 (Related) 2020-02-18 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 2324.
HF2414 (Replaced by) 2020-03-12 - Amendment H-8161 filed. H.J. 596.
SF2324 (Replaced by) 2020-02-26 - Fiscal note.
HF2414 (Replaced by) 2020-03-12 - Amendment H-8161 filed. H.J. 596.
SF2324 (Replaced by) 2020-02-26 - Fiscal note.
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=88&ba=HSB611 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/LGI/88/attachments/HSB611.html |