IA HSB625 | 2019-2020 | 88th General Assembly
Note: Legislation replaced by SF2188
Note: Legislation replaced by HF2495
Note: Legislation replaced by HF2495
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: N/A - 0% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-18 - Committee report, recommending passage. H.J. 299.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: N/A - 0% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-18 - Committee report, recommending passage. H.J. 299.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act concerning federal financial assistance funding for hazard mitigation.
Title
A bill for an act concerning federal financial assistance funding for hazard mitigation.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-18 | House | Committee report, recommending passage. H.J. 299. |
2020-02-12 | House | Subcommittee recommends passage. |
2020-02-11 | House | Subcommittee Meeting: 02/12/2020 4:00PM House Lounge. |
2020-02-04 | House | Subcommittee: Worthan, Fisher and Thede. H.J. 190. |
2020-02-04 | House | By COMMITTEE ON PUBLIC SAFETY |
Same As/Similar To
SSB3057 (Related) 2020-02-06 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 2188.
SF2188 (Replaced by) 2020-06-25 - Fiscal note.
HF2495 (Replaced by) 2020-06-10 - Withdrawn. H.J. 689.
SF2188 (Replaced by) 2020-06-25 - Fiscal note.
HF2495 (Replaced by) 2020-06-10 - Withdrawn. H.J. 689.
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=88&ba=HSB625 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/LGI/88/attachments/HSB625.html |