IA HSB696 | 2019-2020 | 88th General Assembly
Note: Legislation replaced by HF2641
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: N/A - 0% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-03 - Subcommittee recommends passage.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: N/A - 0% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-03 - Subcommittee recommends passage.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to state taxation and related laws of the state, including the administration by the department of revenue of certain tax credits and refunds, income taxes, moneys and credits taxes, sales and use taxes, partnership and pass-through entity audits, and by modifying provisions relating to the reinstatement of business entities, the assessment and valuation of property, and providing penalties, and including effective date and retroactive applicability provisions.(See HF 2641.)
Title
A bill for an act relating to state taxation and related laws of the state, including the administration by the department of revenue of certain tax credits and refunds, income taxes, moneys and credits taxes, sales and use taxes, partnership and pass-through entity audits, and by modifying provisions relating to the reinstatement of business entities, the assessment and valuation of property, and providing penalties, and including effective date and retroactive applicability provisions.(See HF 2641.)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-03 | House | Subcommittee recommends passage. |
2020-03-02 | House | Subcommittee recommends passage. |
2020-02-26 | House | Subcommittee Meeting: 02/27/2020 10:00AM House Lounge. |
2020-02-18 | House | Subcommittee: Hite, Mitchell and Kurth. H.J. 294. |
2020-02-18 | House | By COMMITTEE ON WAYS AND MEANS |
Same As/Similar To
SSB3199 (Related) 2020-03-11 - Subcommittee: Sweeney, Brown, and Dotzler.
HF2641 (Replaced by) 2020-06-29 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 792.
HF2641 (Replaced by) 2020-06-29 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 792.
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=88&ba=HSB696 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/LGI/88/attachments/HSB696.html |