IA HSB88 | 2019-2020 | 88th General Assembly
Note: Legislation replaced by HF388
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: N/A - 0% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-02-13 - Committee report, recommending passage. H.J. 292.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: N/A - 0% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-02-13 - Committee report, recommending passage. H.J. 292.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to special certificates issued to aircraft manufacturers, transporters, and dealers, providing fees, making penalties applicable, and including effective date and applicability provisions.
Title
A bill for an act relating to special certificates issued to aircraft manufacturers, transporters, and dealers, providing fees, making penalties applicable, and including effective date and applicability provisions.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-13 | House | Committee report, recommending passage. H.J. 292. |
2019-02-13 | House | Subcommittee recommends passage. |
2019-02-06 | House | Subcommittee Meeting: 02/07/2019 8:00AM House Lounge. |
2019-01-29 | House | Subcommittee: Maxwell, Sieck and Kurtz. H.J. 180. |
2019-01-29 | House | By COMMITTEE ON TRANSPORTATION |
Same As/Similar To
SSB1040 (Related) 2019-03-28 - Subcommittee Meeting: 04/03/2019 11:30AM Senate Lobbyist Lounge.
HF388 (Replaced by) 2019-02-28 - Subcommittee recommends passage.
HF388 (Replaced by) 2019-02-28 - Subcommittee recommends passage.
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=88&ba=HSB88 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/LGI/88/attachments/HSB88.html |