IA SCR1 | 2019-2020 | 88th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 14 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-04-27 - Rereferred to Education. H.J. 1076.
Pending: House Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

A concurrent resolution urging Congress to enact legislation to limit the interest rates collected or imposed by the United States Department of Education for certain federal student college loans.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

A concurrent resolution urging Congress to enact legislation to limit the interest rates collected or imposed by the United States Department of Education for certain federal student college loans.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-27HouseRereferred to Education. H.J. 1076.
2019-04-03HouseCommittee report, recommending passage. H.J. 738.
2019-04-02HouseSubcommittee recommends passage.
2019-04-01HouseSubcommittee Meeting: 04/02/2019 8:35AM House Lounge.
2019-04-01HouseSubcommittee: Gassman, Mommsen and Steckman. H.J. 707.
2019-03-26HouseRead first time, referred to Education. H.J. 649.
2019-03-26HouseMessage from Senate. H.J. 647.
2019-03-26SenateImmediate message. S.J. 745.
2019-03-26SenateResolution adopted. S.J. 744.
2019-02-05SenateCommittee report, recommending passage. S.J. 235.
2019-01-17SenateSubcommittee: Sweeney, Wahls, and Zaun. S.J. 124.
2019-01-14SenateResolution filed, referred to Education. S.J. 51.

Iowa State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback