IA SF103 | 2019-2020 | 88th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-03-27 - Reported out of committee as SF 606. S.J. 776.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

A bill for an act relating to the transfer of investment tax credits issued to housing businesses under the enterprise zone program, and including effective date and retroactive applicability provisions. (See SF 606.)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

A bill for an act relating to the transfer of investment tax credits issued to housing businesses under the enterprise zone program, and including effective date and retroactive applicability provisions. (See SF 606.)

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-27SenateReported out of committee as SF 606. S.J. 776.
2019-03-19SenateFiscal note.
2019-02-19SenateSubcommittee reassigned: Feenstra, Dawson, and J. Smith. S.J. 343.
2019-01-29SenateSubcommittee: Feenstra, Danielson, and Dawson. S.J. 187.
2019-01-24SenateIntroduced, referred to Ways and Means. S.J. 164.

Same As/Similar To

SF606 (Similar To) 2019-04-16 - Read first time, referred to Ways and Means. H.J. 861.

Iowa State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback