IA SF113 | 2019-2020 | 88th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 21 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-21 - Signed by Governor. S.J. 711.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

A bill for an act allowing certain operating-while-intoxicated offenders to be sentenced as habitual offenders, and making penalties applicable. (Formerly SSB 1002.) Effective 7-1-19.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

A bill for an act allowing certain operating-while-intoxicated offenders to be sentenced as habitual offenders, and making penalties applicable. (Formerly SSB 1002.) Effective 7-1-19.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-11 - House - Passed House (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-18 - Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
House - Passed House (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-21SenateSigned by Governor. S.J. 711.
2019-03-20SenateReported correctly enrolled, signed by President and Speaker, and sent to Governor. S.J. 696.
2019-03-12SenateMessage from House. S.J. 572.
2019-03-11HouseImmediate message. H.J. 496.
2019-03-11HousePassed House, yeas 94, nays none. H.J. 489.
2019-03-11HouseSubstituted for HF 514. H.J. 488.
2019-02-19HouseRead first time, passed on file. H.J. 311.
2019-02-19HouseMessage from Senate. H.J. 308.
2019-02-18SenateImmediate message. S.J. 319.
2019-02-25SenateExplanation of vote. S.J. 393.
2019-02-18SenatePassed Senate, yeas 48, nays 0. S.J. 317.
2019-02-04SenateFiscal note.
2019-01-28SenateCommittee report, approving bill. S.J. 177.
2019-01-28SenateIntroduced, placed on calendar. S.J. 171.

Same As/Similar To

SSB1002 (Related) 2019-01-22 - Subcommittee recommends passage.
HSB29 (Related) 2019-02-21 - Committee report, recommending passage. H.J. 347.
HF514 (Similar To) 2019-03-11 - Withdrawn. H.J. 497.

Iowa State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback