IA SF116 | 2011-2012 | 84th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 21-0)
Status: Introduced on January 27 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-03-14 - Resolution adopted. S.J. 556.
Pending: Senate Labor and Business Relations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 27 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-03-14 - Resolution adopted. S.J. 556.
Pending: Senate Labor and Business Relations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to wage payment collection issues arising between employers and individuals who provide services to employers, providing penalties and remedies, and including effective date provisions. (See SF 311.)
Title
A bill for an act relating to wage payment collection issues arising between employers and individuals who provide services to employers, providing penalties and remedies, and including effective date provisions. (See SF 311.)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-14 | Resolution adopted. S.J. 556. | |
2011-12-31 | END OF 2011 ACTIONS | |
2011-02-01 | Subcommittee, Dotzler, Dearden, and Ward. S.J. 196. | |
2011-01-27 | Introduced, referred to Labor and Business Relations. S.J. 177. |