IA SF116 | 2019-2020 | 88th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on January 28 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-11 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 2224. S.J. 276.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 28 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-11 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 2224. S.J. 276.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to going armed with, carrying, or transporting a firearm when transporting a person to or from a school or delivering an item to the school. (Formerly SSB 1017; See SF 2224.)
Title
A bill for an act relating to going armed with, carrying, or transporting a firearm when transporting a person to or from a school or delivering an item to the school. (Formerly SSB 1017; See SF 2224.)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-11 | Senate | Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 2224. S.J. 276. |
2020-01-23 | Senate | Subcommittee recommends amendment and passage. |
2020-01-21 | Senate | Subcommittee Meeting: 01/23/2020 1:00PM RM 315. |
2020-01-15 | Senate | Subcommittee: Schultz, Kinney, and Sinclair. S.J. 85. |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Referred to Judiciary. S.J. 858. |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Amendment S-3083 filed. S.J. 779. |
2019-02-27 | Senate | Fiscal note. |
2019-01-28 | Senate | Committee report, approving bill. S.J. 177. |
2019-01-28 | Senate | Introduced, placed on calendar. S.J. 171. |
Same As/Similar To
SSB1017 (Related) 2019-01-16 - Subcommittee recommends passage.
SF2224 (Similar To) 2020-02-17 - Fiscal note.
SF2224 (Similar To) 2020-02-17 - Fiscal note.
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=88&ba=SF116 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/LGI/88/attachments/SF116.html |