IA SF131 | 2019-2020 | 88th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 28 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-04-25 - Reported out of committee as SF 640. S.J. 1140.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

A bill for an act relating to the exemption from the hotel and motel taxes for the renting of lodging after a certain number of consecutive days. (See SF 640.)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

A bill for an act relating to the exemption from the hotel and motel taxes for the renting of lodging after a certain number of consecutive days. (See SF 640.)

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-25SenateReported out of committee as SF 640. S.J. 1140.
2019-03-18SenateFiscal note.
2019-02-19SenateSubcommittee reassigned: Dawson, Carlin, and J. Smith. S.J. 343.
2019-01-29SenateSubcommittee: Dawson, Carlin, and Danielson. S.J. 188.
2019-01-28SenateIntroduced, referred to Ways and Means. S.J. 174.

Same As/Similar To

HF171 (Similar To) 2019-04-24 - Withdrawn. H.J. 1011.
HF760 (Similar To) 2019-04-27 - Message from Senate. H.J. 1075.
SF640 (Similar To) 2019-04-26 - Withdrawn. S.J. 1152.

Iowa State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback