IA SF134 | 2015-2016 | 86th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 31 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-31 - Signed by Governor. S.J. 756.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 31 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-31 - Signed by Governor. S.J. 756.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
A bill for an act concerning bonding requirements for a wine direct shipper license. (Formerly SSB 1061.) Effective 7-1-15.
Title
A bill for an act concerning bonding requirements for a wine direct shipper license. (Formerly SSB 1061.) Effective 7-1-15.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-03-17 - House - Passed House (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-09 - Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-09 - Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-31 | Senate | Signed by Governor. S.J. 756. |
2015-03-30 | Senate | Sent to Governor. S.J. 742. |
2015-03-30 | Senate | Reported correctly enrolled, signed by President and Speaker. S.J. 742. |
2015-03-17 | Senate | Message from House. S.J. 627. |
2015-03-17 | House | Immediate message. H.J. 604. |
2015-03-24 | House | Explanation of vote. H.J. 690. |
2015-03-17 | House | Explanation of vote. H.J. 632. |
2015-03-17 | House | Passed House, ayes 96, nays none. H.J. 592. |
2015-03-17 | House | Substituted for HF 492. H.J. 592. |
2015-03-13 | House | Placed on calendar under unfinished business. H.J. 580. |
2015-03-10 | House | Read first time, passed on file. H.J. 502. |
2015-03-09 | House | Message from Senate. H.J. 498. |
2015-03-09 | Senate | Immediate message. S.J. 469. |
2015-03-09 | Senate | Passed Senate, ayes 49, nays none. S.J. 468. |
2015-02-03 | Senate | Committee report, approving bill. S.J. 211. |
2015-02-03 | Senate | Introduced, placed on calendar. S.J. 202. |