IA SF140 | 2019-2020 | 88th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 15 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-15 - Signed by Governor. S.J. 949.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 15 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-15 - Signed by Governor. S.J. 949.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to special minor's driver's licenses for students attending accredited nonpublic schools. (Formerly SSB 1033.) Effective 7-1-19.
Title
A bill for an act relating to special minor's driver's licenses for students attending accredited nonpublic schools. (Formerly SSB 1033.) Effective 7-1-19.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-03 - House - Passed House (Y: 91 N: 8 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-12 - Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 46 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 46 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-12 - Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 46 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 46 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-15 | Senate | Signed by Governor. S.J. 949. |
2019-04-15 | Senate | Reported correctly enrolled, signed by President and Speaker, and sent to Governor. S.J. 949. |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Message from House. S.J. 854. |
2019-04-03 | House | Immediate message. H.J. 736. |
2019-04-03 | House | Passed House, yeas 91, nays 8. H.J. 728. |
2019-04-03 | House | Substituted for HF 517. H.J. 727. |
2019-03-14 | House | Placed on calendar under unfinished business. H.J. 562. |
2019-03-13 | House | Read first time, passed on file. H.J. 529. |
2019-03-12 | House | Message from Senate. H.J. 501. |
2019-03-12 | Senate | Immediate message. S.J. 584. |
2019-03-12 | Senate | Passed Senate, yeas 46, nays 3. S.J. 581. |
2019-01-29 | Senate | Committee report, approving bill. S.J. 190. |
2019-01-29 | Senate | Introduced, placed on calendar. S.J. 183. |
Same As/Similar To
SSB1033 (Related) 2019-01-24 - Subcommittee recommends passage.
HF237 (Similar To) 2019-04-03 - Withdrawn. H.J. 736.
HF517 (Similar To) 2019-04-03 - Withdrawn. H.J. 736.
HF237 (Similar To) 2019-04-03 - Withdrawn. H.J. 736.
HF517 (Similar To) 2019-04-03 - Withdrawn. H.J. 736.