IA SF152 | 2009-2010 | 83rd General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 22 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-01-07 - * * * * * END OF 2009 ACTIONS * * * * *

Summary

A bill for an act relating to administrative and planning requirements involving children for whom the department of human services has responsibility under state or federal law. (Formerly SSB 1104.) Effective 7-1-09.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

A bill for an act relating to administrative and planning requirements involving children for whom the department of human services has responsibility under state or federal law. (Formerly SSB 1104.) Effective 7-1-09.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2010-01-07 * * * * * END OF 2009 ACTIONS * * * * *
2009-05-22 Signed by Governor. S.J. 1279.
2009-04-26 Sent to Governor. S.J. 1279.
2009-04-26 Reported correctly enrolled, signed by President and Speaker. S.J. 1279.
2009-04-06 Message from House. S.J. 975.
2009-04-06 Immediate message. H.J. 1175.
2009-04-06 Passed House, ayes 97, nays none. H.J. 1169.
2009-04-06 Motion to suspend rules failed. H.J. 1169.
2009-04-06 Motion to suspend rules to consider H-1322. H.J. 1168.
2009-04-06 Ruled not germane H-1322. H.J. 1168.
2009-04-06 Point of order raised H-1322 not germane. H.J. 1168.
2009-04-06 Amendment H-1298 withdrawn. H.J. 1166.
2009-03-26 Amendment H-1322 filed. H.J. 1051.
2009-03-25 Amendment H-1298 filed. H.J. 1038.
2009-03-23 Committee report, recommending passage. H.J. 990.
2009-03-19 Subcommittee, Hunter, Heaton, and Smith. H.J. 906.
2009-03-13 Read first time, referred to Human Resources. H.J. 799.
2009-03-12 Message from Senate. H.J. 771.
2009-03-11 Immediate message. S.J. 621.
2009-03-11 Passed Senate, ayes 50, nays none. S.J. 619.
2009-03-11 Amendment S-3068 filed, adopted. S.J. 619.
2009-02-16 Committee report, approving bill. S.J. 306.
2009-02-16 Introduced, placed on calendar. S.J. 301.

Iowa State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback