IA SF153 | 2019-2020 | 88th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 30 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-04-10 - Withdrawn. S.J. 918.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

A bill for an act relating to the exploitation of a dependent adult by a caretaker. (Formerly SSB 1015.)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

A bill for an act relating to the exploitation of a dependent adult by a caretaker. (Formerly SSB 1015.)

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-10SenateWithdrawn. S.J. 918.
2019-04-10SenateHF 323 substituted. S.J. 917.
2019-04-04SenatePlaced on calendar under unfinished business. S.J. 857.
2019-02-21SenateAttached to companion HF 323. S.J. 370.
2019-01-30SenateCommittee report, approving bill. S.J. 199.
2019-01-30SenateIntroduced, placed on calendar. S.J. 194.

Same As/Similar To

SSB1015 (Related) 2019-01-24 - Subcommittee recommends passage.
HSB21 (Related) 2019-02-06 - Committee report, recommending passage. H.J. 231.
HF323 (Similar To) 2019-04-23 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 981.

Iowa State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback