IA SF155 | 2019-2020 | 88th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 10 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-10 - Signed by Governor. S.J. 587.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 10 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-10 - Signed by Governor. S.J. 587.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to the practice of barbering in movable locations, and including effective date provisions. Effective date: 03/10/2020.
Title
A bill for an act relating to the practice of barbering in movable locations, and including effective date provisions. Effective date: 03/10/2020.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-02 - House - Passed House (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-02 - Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-03-02 - Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-10 | Senate | Signed by Governor. S.J. 587. |
2020-03-09 | Senate | Reported correctly enrolled, signed by President and Speaker, and sent to Governor. S.J. 545. |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Message from House. S.J. 486. |
2020-03-02 | House | Immediate message. H.J. 415. |
2020-03-10 | House | Explanation of vote. H.J. 566. |
2020-03-09 | House | Explanation of vote. H.J. 532. |
2020-03-04 | House | Explanation of vote. H.J. 486. |
2020-03-02 | House | Explanation of vote. H.J. 416. |
2020-03-02 | House | Passed House, yeas 92, nays none. H.J. 414. |
2020-03-02 | House | Substituted for HF 2195. H.J. 413. |
2020-03-02 | House | Read first time, passed on file. H.J. 413. |
2020-03-02 | House | Message from Senate. H.J. 412. |
2020-03-02 | Senate | Immediate message. S.J. 476. |
2020-03-02 | Senate | Passed Senate, yeas 49, nays 0. S.J. 473. |
2020-03-02 | Senate | Amendment S-5006 adopted, as amended. S.J. 473. |
2020-03-02 | Senate | Amendment S-5007 adopted. S.J. 473. |
2020-02-18 | Senate | Amendment S-5007 to S-5006 filed. S.J. 345. |
2020-02-17 | Senate | Amendment S-5006 filed. S.J. 326. |
2020-02-17 | Senate | Committee report, recommending amendment and passage. S.J. 326. |
2020-01-28 | Senate | Subcommittee recommends amendment and passage. |
2020-01-21 | Senate | Subcommittee Meeting: 01/27/2020 1:30PM RM 315. |
2020-01-15 | Senate | Subcommittee reassigned: Whiting, Giddens, and Miller-Meeks. S.J. 85. |
2019-02-12 | Senate | Subcommittee recommends passage. |
2019-02-05 | Senate | Subcommittee: Whiting, Danielson, and Miller-Meeks. S.J. 233. |
2019-01-30 | Senate | Introduced, referred to State Government. S.J. 194. |