IA SF158 | 2019-2020 | 88th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 1 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-01 - Signed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

A bill for an act relating to postconviction relief procedure and the underlying trial court record of the proceedings challenged. (Formerly SSB 1005.) Effective 7-1-19.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

A bill for an act relating to postconviction relief procedure and the underlying trial court record of the proceedings challenged. (Formerly SSB 1005.) Effective 7-1-19.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-18 - House - Passed House (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-20 - Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-01SenateSigned by Governor.
2019-04-30SenateReported correctly enrolled, signed by President and Speaker, and sent to Governor.
2019-04-19SenateMessage from House. S.J. 1024.
2019-04-18HouseImmediate message. H.J. 922.
2019-04-24HouseExplanation of vote. H.J. 1013.
2019-04-18HousePassed House, yeas 95 nays none. H.J. 911.
2019-04-18HouseSubstituted for HF 336. H.J. 910.
2019-03-20HouseRead first time, passed on file. H.J. 590.
2019-03-20HouseMessage from Senate. H.J. 589.
2019-03-20SenateImmediate message. S.J. 682.
2019-03-20SenatePassed Senate, yeas 49, nays 0. S.J. 678.
2019-03-20SenateAmendment S-3056 filed, adopted. S.J. 678.
2019-01-31SenateCommittee report, approving bill. S.J. 210.
2019-01-31SenateIntroduced, placed on calendar. S.J. 204.

Same As/Similar To

SSB1005 (Related) 2019-01-23 - Subcommittee recommends amendment and passage.
HSB28 (Related) 2019-02-06 - Committee report, recommending amendment and passage. H.J. 232.
HF336 (Similar To) 2019-04-18 - Withdrawn. H.J. 922.

Iowa State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback